House | 02/10/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 269) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Lamosao, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-07-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Pending introduction. |