Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 11). | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Prefiled. |