Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from AEN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 429).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Kila voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Alcos; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-02-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 250) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|