LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1337
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB1337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB1337
Action History
House
02/15/2023
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/13/2023
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
02/10/2023
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23.
House
02/08/2023
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
01/30/2023
Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
House
01/25/2023
Introduced and Pass First Reading.