House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Lamosao, Matsumoto, Souza voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 415) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|