House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-23 at 04:30pm in Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 1:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 883).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 4:40PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Belatti, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Amato, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Aquino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 666).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 677) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1507) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 03-17-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 220).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 962), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 456) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Re-referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|