Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Act 094, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Act 094, on 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 8 offered by Rep. Mizuno.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 05-04-23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Report filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Separated Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 8 offered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 137).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 137) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Kobayashi, Amato, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-23 at 04:40pm in Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 1:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 4:45PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Amato, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 865) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1858) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1315) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 221).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 963), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|