Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to AEN/EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 441).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from AGR/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/ECD on Friday, 02-10-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to AGR/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|