Hawaii 2023 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023