Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Act 095, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Act 095, on 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Deferred One Day 05-04-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 144).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 144) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Belatti, Aiu, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-23 at 04:45pm in Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 990).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Wakai added as Co-Chair. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:05PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 988).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Dela Cruz added as Co-Chair. Senator Wakai discharged as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 11:05AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 10:25AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-23 10:25AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 10:30AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Belatti, Aiu Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Moriwaki, Wakai Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 871) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1889) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from HOU/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HOU/HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 225).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from HSG/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HLT on Friday, 02-10-23 11:15AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HSG/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|