Hawaii 2023 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1409 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023