Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Act 010, 03/31/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Act 010, on 03/31/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Keith-Agaran). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-20-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 288), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|