Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 18).
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to LGO, WAL, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|