LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB148
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB148
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB148
Action History
House
02/15/2023
The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/13/2023
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
01/25/2023
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
House
01/19/2023
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/17/2023
Prefiled.