Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1180) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 413) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|