LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB189
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB189
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB189
Action History
House
02/14/2023
The committee(s) on TRN/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/10/2023
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-23 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
01/27/2023
Re-referred to TRN/EEP, JHA, referral sheet 2
House
01/25/2023
Referred to TRN, EEP, JHA, referral sheet 1
House
01/19/2023
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/18/2023
Pending introduction.