Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-13-23 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to WTL, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 683) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|