Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on EET deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to AEN/EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 143).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 989), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|