Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 177, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 177, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 49).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 49) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Sayama, Aiu, Evslin, Hussey-Burdick, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 3:05PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 982).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Sayama Co-Chairs; Aiu, Evslin, Hussey-Burdick, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 726) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1749) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-23 10:01AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-16-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HOU, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 29).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|