Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Hashimoto, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Aiu, Amato, Garcia.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 729) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1735) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from HOU/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HOU/HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 231) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Re-referred to HUS, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 8
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Recommitted to HUS as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HUS for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HUS, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|