House | 02/16/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Reported from EEP/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Quinlan, Pierick. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/ECD on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to EEP/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Pending introduction. |