House | 02/14/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela, Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 02-10-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Pending introduction. |