Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 213, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 213, on 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Ihara). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 117).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Aquino, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Kahaloa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 2:30PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 11:00AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 11:10AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; Hussey-Burdick, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Re-referred to AGR, WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 34
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 721).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 683) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 1:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 36).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chun, Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-01-23 9:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to AGR, WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|