House | 02/16/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 546) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-13-23 2:20PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Pending introduction. |