House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from EEP/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kahaloa; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Friday, 02-03-23 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to EEP/HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|