Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Takayama Co-Chairs; Martinez, Mizuno, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 734) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1763) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on TCA will reconsider its previous decision made on 03-21-23 and will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 40).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 03-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 794) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 02-03-23 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|