Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 080, 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 080, on 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 872).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-06-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 931).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 666).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 661) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1584) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1395) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to HHS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 275).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-17-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 203) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HUS, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|