Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 276).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1148) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Belatti, Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|