Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 277). | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-17-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Pending introduction. |