Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 282).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Poepoe, Sayama, Tam voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Lowen, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Lowen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|