Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 381 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 H.D. | |
1 | + | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 381 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 H.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO CONDOMINIUMS. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: | |
2 | 2 | ||
3 | 3 | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 381 | |
4 | - | THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 H.D. | |
4 | + | THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 H.D. 1 | |
5 | 5 | STATE OF HAWAII | |
6 | 6 | ||
7 | 7 | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES | |
8 | 8 | ||
9 | 9 | H.B. NO. | |
10 | 10 | ||
11 | 11 | 381 | |
12 | 12 | ||
13 | 13 | THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 | |
14 | 14 | ||
15 | - | H.D. | |
15 | + | H.D. 1 | |
16 | 16 | ||
17 | 17 | STATE OF HAWAII | |
18 | 18 | ||
19 | 19 | ||
20 | 20 | ||
21 | 21 | ||
22 | 22 | ||
23 | 23 | ||
24 | 24 | ||
25 | 25 | ||
26 | 26 | ||
27 | 27 | ||
28 | 28 | ||
29 | 29 | ||
30 | 30 | ||
31 | 31 | A BILL FOR AN ACT | |
32 | 32 | ||
33 | 33 | ||
34 | 34 | ||
35 | 35 | ||
36 | 36 | ||
37 | 37 | RELATING TO CONDOMINIUMS. | |
38 | 38 | ||
39 | 39 | ||
40 | 40 | ||
41 | 41 | ||
42 | 42 | ||
43 | 43 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: | |
44 | 44 | ||
45 | 45 | ||
46 | 46 | ||
47 | - | SECTION 1. Act 187, Session Laws of Hawaii 2013, as amended by Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, section 6, is amended by amending section 5 to read as follows: "SECTION 5. The department of commerce and consumer affairs professional and vocational licensing division's budget ceiling shall be amended to reflect the additional annual condominium education trust fund fee required by section 514B‑72(a)(2), Hawaii Revised Statutes, and paid into the condominium education trust fund, established by section 514B‑71, Hawaii Revised Statutes. On June 30 of every odd-numbered year, any unexpended additional amounts paid into the condominium education trust fund and initially dedicated to supporting mediation or voluntary binding arbitration[, until June 30, 2023,] of condominium related disputes, as required by section 514B‑72(a)(2), Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be used for educational purposes as provided in section 514B-71(a)(1), (2), and (3), Hawaii Revised Statutes." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. SECTION | |
47 | + | SECTION 1. Act 187, Session Laws of Hawaii 2013, as amended by Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, section 6, is amended by amending section 5 to read as follows: "SECTION 5. The department of commerce and consumer affairs professional and vocational licensing division's budget ceiling shall be amended to reflect the additional annual condominium education trust fund fee required by section 514B‑72(a)(2), Hawaii Revised Statutes, and paid into the condominium education trust fund, established by section 514B‑71, Hawaii Revised Statutes. On June 30 of every odd-numbered year, any unexpended additional amounts paid into the condominium education trust fund and initially dedicated to supporting mediation or voluntary binding arbitration[, until June 30, 2023,] of condominium related disputes, as required by section 514B‑72(a)(2), Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be used for educational purposes as provided in section 514B-71(a)(1), (2), and (3), Hawaii Revised Statutes." SECTION 2. Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, is amended by amending section 9 to read as follows: "SECTION 9. This Act shall take effect on January 2, 2019[, and, except for section 6, shall be repealed on June 30, 2023; provided that sections 514B-71(a), 514B-72(a), and 514B-161, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which they read on January 1, 2019]." SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on June 30, 3000; provided that sections 1 and 2 shall take effect on June 29, 2023. | |
48 | 48 | ||
49 | 49 | SECTION 1. Act 187, Session Laws of Hawaii 2013, as amended by Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, section 6, is amended by amending section 5 to read as follows: | |
50 | 50 | ||
51 | 51 | "SECTION 5. The department of commerce and consumer affairs professional and vocational licensing division's budget ceiling shall be amended to reflect the additional annual condominium education trust fund fee required by section 514B‑72(a)(2), Hawaii Revised Statutes, and paid into the condominium education trust fund, established by section 514B‑71, Hawaii Revised Statutes. On June 30 of every odd-numbered year, any unexpended additional amounts paid into the condominium education trust fund and initially dedicated to supporting mediation or voluntary binding arbitration[, until June 30, 2023,] of condominium related disputes, as required by section 514B‑72(a)(2), Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be used for educational purposes as provided in section 514B-71(a)(1), (2), and (3), Hawaii Revised Statutes." | |
52 | 52 | ||
53 | - | SECTION 2. | |
53 | + | SECTION 2. Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, is amended by amending section 9 to read as follows: | |
54 | 54 | ||
55 | - | SECTION | |
55 | + | "SECTION 9. This Act shall take effect on January 2, 2019[, and, except for section 6, shall be repealed on June 30, 2023; provided that sections 514B-71(a), 514B-72(a), and 514B-161, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall be reenacted in the form in which they read on January 1, 2019]." | |
56 | 56 | ||
57 | - | Report Title: Condominiums; Alternative Dispute Resolution; Binding Arbitration; Mediation; Cutoff Date; Repeal Description: Repeals the cutoff date of Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, that allowed the use of funds in the condominium education trust fund initially dedicated to support voluntary binding arbitration to be used for other educational purposes. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. | |
57 | + | SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. | |
58 | + | ||
59 | + | SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on June 30, 3000; provided that sections 1 and 2 shall take effect on June 29, 2023. | |
60 | + | ||
61 | + | Report Title: Condominiums; Alternative Dispute Resolution; Binding Arbitration; Mediation; Sunset; Repeal Description: Repeals the sunset date of Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, that allowed for voluntary binding arbitration for condominium related disputes and amended the conditions for mediation. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. | |
58 | 62 | ||
59 | 63 | ||
60 | 64 | ||
61 | 65 | ||
62 | 66 | ||
63 | 67 | Report Title: | |
64 | 68 | ||
65 | - | Condominiums; Alternative Dispute Resolution; Binding Arbitration; Mediation; | |
69 | + | Condominiums; Alternative Dispute Resolution; Binding Arbitration; Mediation; Sunset; Repeal | |
66 | 70 | ||
67 | 71 | ||
68 | 72 | ||
69 | 73 | Description: | |
70 | 74 | ||
71 | - | Repeals the | |
75 | + | Repeals the sunset date of Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, that allowed for voluntary binding arbitration for condominium related disputes and amended the conditions for mediation. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1) | |
72 | 76 | ||
73 | 77 | ||
74 | 78 | ||
75 | 79 | ||
76 | 80 | ||
77 | 81 | ||
78 | 82 | ||
79 | 83 | The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. |