House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; San Buenaventura, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 512).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 520) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Shimabukuro . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Richards). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-30-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1423) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 286).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 393) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-08-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|