Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Act 028, 04/26/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Act 028, on 04/26/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 703).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1760) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1209) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 3:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 47).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aiu, Chun, Lamosao voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Quinlan, Souza, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Quinlan, Souza, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Tam excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Souza; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|