House | 02/14/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |