House
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HUS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HUS.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-03-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CMV, HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|