House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:05PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 12:59PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 10:31AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 10:31AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-23 10:45AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 10:30AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Kila Co-Chairs; Martinez, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Elefante.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 744) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1864) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 51).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|