LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB486
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB486
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB486
Action History
House
02/15/2023
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/10/2023
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-15-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
01/25/2023
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
House
01/23/2023
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/20/2023
Pending introduction.