Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Act 060, 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Act 060, on 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 9).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 9) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Lamosao, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 3:02PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Lamosao, Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 666).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 663) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1511) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|