House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 260) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-01-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|