Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 23).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 494), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-31-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|