Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 144, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 144, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 14).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 14) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Nakashima, Evslin, Hussey-Burdick, Kila, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 11:15AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Evslin, Hussey-Burdick, Kila, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 750) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1817) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to TCA, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 57).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-02-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|