Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-16-23 3:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 58).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 03-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|