Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 084, 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 084, on 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 721).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 688) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HRE, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 62).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-10-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 130) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-03-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|