House | 02/17/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 615) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |