House | 02/06/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3). | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |