House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-23 at 04:30pm in Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-28-23 2:45PM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-23 9:05AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Holt, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Kong, Lamosao, Onishi, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 721).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 690) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 1:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-08-23 10:15AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|