Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1328) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 1:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 314).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-13-23 2:20PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|