House | 03/07/2023 | Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Quinlan excused. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi. | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 4 | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |