House | 02/09/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Belatti, Hashem. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |