Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Act 043, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Act 043, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Chun, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kong, Lamosao, Martinez, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (12) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 874).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 763) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Gabbard, Kim). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1805) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1414) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 324).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aiu, Chun, Lamosao, Martinez voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Belatti). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 1 offered by Rep. Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Alcos, Lamosao voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 100) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|